US HB290 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Terminates (1) the taxpayer election to designate $3 of income tax liability for financing of presidential election campaigns, (2) the Presidential Election Campaign Fund, and (3) the Presidential Primary Matching Payment Account. The Department of the Treasury must transfer the funds remaining in the Presidential Election Campaign Fund to the 10-Year Pediatric Research Initiative Fund.
Title
To reduce Federal spending and the deficit by terminating taxpayer financing of presidential election campaigns.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1827 (Related) 2019-03-18 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2234 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3225 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2234 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3225 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Child health
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government trust funds
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Research administration and funding
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Child health
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government trust funds
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Research administration and funding
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/290/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr290/BILLS-116hr290ih.pdf |