US HB290 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to render an individual, who transfers certain educational assistance, to which the individual is entitled because of an agreement by such individual to serve in the Armed Forces, to a dependent of that individual, and who fails to complete such agreement, solely liable for the overpayment of such educational assistance.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to render an individual, who transfers certain educational assistance, to which the individual is entitled because of an agreement by such individual to serve in the Armed Forces, to a dependent of that individual, and who fails to complete such agreement, solely liable for the overpayment of such educational assistance.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-06-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2781) |
2021-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 290. |
2021-06-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2781-2782) |
2021-06-15 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-05-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 6. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |