US HB2906 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2025 the Clean School Bus Program, including to authorize the Environmental Protection Agency to award grants for up to 60% of the replacement costs of acquiring clean school buses and charging and fueling infrastructure.
Title
Clean Commute for Kids Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2020-01-09 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Child health
Elementary and secondary education
Energy efficiency and conservation
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Motor carriers
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Oil and gas
Transportation and public works
Transportation costs
Child health
Elementary and secondary education
Energy efficiency and conservation
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Motor carriers
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Oil and gas
Transportation and public works
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2906/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2906/BILLS-116hr2906ih.pdf |