US HB291 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management from offering any tract for oil and gas leasing or preleasing until June 30, 2029, in the following areas: the North Atlantic planning area, the Mid-Atlantic planning area, the South Atlantic planning area, the Straits of Florida planning area, or the Eastern Gulf of Mexico planning area that is within 125 miles of the coastline of Florida.
Title
Coastal Economies Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-01-10 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H372) |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/291/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr291/BILLS-116hr291ih.pdf |