US HB291 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-19 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-19 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to use on-site regulated medical waste treatment systems at certain Department of Veterans Affairs facilities, and for other purposes.
Title
VA COST SAVINGS Enhancements Act Department of Veterans Affairs Creation of On-Site Treatment Systems Affording Veterans Improvements and Numerous General Safety Enhancements Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-18 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2022-06-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/291/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr291/BILLS-117hr291ih.pdf |