US HB2917 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a series of restrictions and requirements relating to opioid marketing and distribution practices. Specifically, the bill prohibits (1) knowingly making false advertising or marketing claims regarding the addictive nature of opioids; (2) knowingly supplying communities with quantities of opioids that are not medically reasonable; or (3) failing to report distribution orders, or patterns of orders, while knowing that the orders are not being dispensed in a medically reasonable manner. Employees of opioid manufacturers and distributors are subject to civil penalties and imprisonment for violations; corporations and executives are subject to civil penalties. Manufacturers shall also lose their period of market exclusivity. Additionally, the Department of Health and Human Services must assess a fee against each corporation that, between January 1, 1993, and the date of enactment of this bill, manufactured or distributed opioids, if such opioids were covered under a federal health program at least once during this period. Manufacturers that fail to pay the fee shall lose associated drug approval until the fee is paid in full. The bill authorizes collected civil penalties and fees to be used for activities that address opioid misuse and abuse, including family and educational programs.
Title
Opioid Crisis Accountability Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1584 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Corporate finance and management
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Marketing and advertising
Prescription drugs
Securities
Wages and earnings
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Corporate finance and management
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Marketing and advertising
Prescription drugs
Securities
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2917/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2917/BILLS-116hr2917ih.pdf |