US HB293 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish qualifications for the human resources positions within the Veterans Health Administration of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
VA Hospitals Establishing Leadership Performance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-06-15 | House | Pursuant to section 8 of H. Res. 473, and the motion offered by Mr. McGovern, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 293; H.R. 587; H.R. 610, as amended; H.R. 1144, as amended; H.R. 1703, as amended; H.R. 1921; H.R. 2008; H.R. 2332, as amended; H.R. 2545; and H.R. 3642, as amended. (consideration: CR H2792-2799; text: CR H2792) |
2021-06-15 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 473, proceedings on H.R. 293 are considered vacated. |
2021-06-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 293. |
2021-06-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2780-2781; text: CR H2780) |
2021-06-15 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-05-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 6. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR473 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H2716)
HB8017 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8017 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.