US HB2934 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs to provide educational assistance for certain preparatory courses. Under the bill, veterans who are entitled to educational assistance may also receive assistance for preparatory courses that are required for licensing or certification tests for employment in specified professions.
Title
GI Bill Access to Career Credentials Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-05-22 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E655) |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2345 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3504 (Related) 2020-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 116-154. (TXT | PDF)
HB3504 (Related) 2020-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 116-154. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2934/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2934/BILLS-116hr2934ih.pdf |