US HB2935 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds five fentanyl analogues and the entire category of fentanyl-related substances to schedule I of the Controlled Substances Act. A schedule I controlled substance is a drug, substance, or chemical that has a high potential for abuse; has no currently accepted medical value; and is subject to regulatory controls and administrative, civil, and criminal penalties under the Controlled Substances Act.
Title
Stopping Overdoses of Fentanyl Analogues Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1622 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2701 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5421 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3148 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
HB5771 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3342 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2701 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5421 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3148 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
HB5771 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3342 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2935/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2935/BILLS-116hr2935ih.pdf |