US HB2940 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To extend the program of block grants to States for temporary assistance for needy families and related programs through September 30, 2019. This bill extends appropriations through September 30, 2019, for Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program grants to states and related assistance grants to U.S. territories such as Puerto Rico and the Virgin Islands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To extend the program of block grants to States for temporary assistance for needy families and related programs through September 30, 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 233 (Y: 357 N: 55 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-05SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-27.
2019-07-05SenateSigned by President.
2019-06-28SenatePresented to President.
2019-06-28SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4648)
2019-06-04SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2019-06-03HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-03HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 357 - 55 (Roll no. 233). (text: CR H4195)
2019-06-03HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4204-4205)
2019-06-03HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-06-03HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2940.
2019-06-03HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4195-4198)
2019-06-03HouseMr. Davis, Danny K. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-05-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-05-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB430 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Became Public Law No: 116-4. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback