US HB2956 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 514.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 514.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to establish the Western Riverside County National Wildlife Refuge in California. Interior must include within the boundaries of the refuge the lands and waters within the Western Riverside County Multiple Species Habitat Conservation Plan Area that are owned by the federal government, a state, or a political subdivision of a state upon the establishment of the refuge. Interior may enter into cooperative agreements with the State of California, any of its political subdivisions, or any other persons to (1) manage lands that are owned by California, the subdivision, or the other person and located within the refuge; and (2) promote public awareness of the natural resources of the conservation area; or (3) encourage participation by the public in the conservation of such resources. Interior may acquire by donation, purchase, or exchange the lands and waters or interests in them (including conservation easements) within the refuge, except those which are owned by California and its political subdivisions may be acquired by donation only. Federal property in the refuge must be assessed for inclusion in the refuge and must be transferred to Interior if deemed suitable for inclusion.
Title
To provide for the establishment of the Western Riverside County Wildlife Refuge.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 514. |
2020-12-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-629. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2020-01-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
California
Endangered and threatened species
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Endangered and threatened species
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection