US HB297 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 48.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians Restoration Act of 2019 This bill extends federal recognition to the Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians of Montana. The bill makes the tribe and its members eligible for services and benefits provided to federally recognized tribes and their members, without regard to the existence of a reservation or the location of the residence of any member. The service area of the tribe is considered to be the area comprised of Blaine, Cascade, Glacier, and Hill Counties, Montana. The tribe must submit a membership roll to the Department of the Interior as a condition of receiving recognition, services, and benefits. The tribe must maintain the membership roll. Interior must take into trust for the benefit of the tribe 200 acres of land within the tribe's service area to be used for a tribal land base.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Little Shell Tribe of Chippewa Indians Restoration Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 129 (Y: 403 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 48.
2019-03-27SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
2019-03-26HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-03-26HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 21 (Roll no. 129). (text: CR H2813-2814)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2816-2817)
2019-03-26HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-03-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 297.
2019-03-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2813-2814)
2019-03-26HouseMr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB51 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-07-02 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback