US HB2982 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to conduct a study of the barriers for women veterans to health care from the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
Women Veterans Health Care Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3224 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Child care and development
Comprehensive health care
Congressional oversight
Disability and health-based discrimination
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Mental health
Public contracts and procurement
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
Child care and development
Comprehensive health care
Congressional oversight
Disability and health-based discrimination
Government studies and investigations
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Mental health
Public contracts and procurement
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2982/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2982/BILLS-116hr2982ih.pdf |