US HB2999 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides statutory authority for the Tribal HUD-VASH program, which provides rental assistance and supportive services to Native American veterans who are homeless or at risk of homelessness and living in or near an area where a tribe or tribally designated housing entity provides assistance for affordable housing. The Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) is directed to use at least 5% of rental assistance amounts under the HUD-VASH program, which provides housing assistance to homeless veterans, for the Tribal HUD-VASH program. The Tribal HUD-VASH program shall be carried out in conjunction with the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA). HUD and the VA shall consult with tribal organizations regarding the program's design and may make program modifications after consulting with tribal organizations. Program grants shall be made to entities eligible for Native American housing assistance block grants. HUD may make renewal grants to entities that have received prior program grants.
Title
Tribal HUD–VASH Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB257 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB5319 (Related) 2019-12-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB4090 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
HB5319 (Related) 2019-12-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB4090 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2999/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2999/BILLS-116hr2999ih.pdf |