US HB3018 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 143.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 143.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) from implementing, administering, enforcing, or in any manner making effective the proposed rule titled Revised Requirements Under Community Planning and Development Housing Programs, published by HUD in Spring 2019, or any final rule based substantially on such proposed rule. The rule allows, among other things, shelter providers under HUD programs that permit certain single-sex or sex-segregated facilities to establish a policy by which such providers may consider an individual's sex to determine accommodation within or admission to a shelter or its facility.
Title
Ensuring Equal Access to Shelter Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 143. |
2019-08-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-185. |
2019-06-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 26. |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2007 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1904 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1904 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing discrimination
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Congressional oversight
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development
Housing and community development funding
Housing discrimination
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination