US HB3030 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2029 the Patient-Centered Outcomes Research Trust Fund, which supports research that evaluates and compares outcomes and the clinical effectiveness, risks, and benefits of two or more medical treatments, services, or other health practices. Additionally, the bill extends specified fees on private health insurance plans, including self-insured plans, which support the trust.
Title
Patient-Centered Outcomes Research Extension Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3439 (Related) 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 579.
SB2897 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2897 (Related) 2019-11-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Appropriations
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Sales and excise taxes
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Sales and excise taxes
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3030/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3030/BILLS-116hr3030ih.pdf |