US HB3036 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-9)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to implement changes to better serve women veterans. Among other requirements, the VA must retrofit its existing medical facilities to support the provision of care to women veterans. Additionally, the VA must ensure its medical facilities have at least one full-time or part-time women's health provider. The bill also requires the VA to establish a training module for community providers that is specific to women veterans.
Title
Breaking Barriers for Women Veterans Act
Sponsors
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-05-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB514 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 536.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment and training programs
Government studies and investigations
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment and training programs
Government studies and investigations
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3036/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3036/BILLS-116hr3036ih.pdf |