US HB3060 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revamps, modifies, and revises the organization, activities, and processes of the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA). Among other things, it requires FEMA to divide its Office of Response and Recovery into an Office of Disaster Response and an Office of Disaster Recovery, and to report on its ability to support a state managed and locally executed casework management system to coordinate and deliver direct assistance to disaster survivors. Disaster Recovery Small Business Grant Act The bill establishes within the Small Business Administration an Office of Disaster Recovery Small Business Grants. It also reauthorizes through FY2029 the temporary reassignment of state and local personnel during a public health emergency.
Title
FEMA Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB42 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB6292 (Related) 2020-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB6292 (Related) 2020-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic performance and conditions
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Federal-Indian relations
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Life, casualty, property insurance
Low- and moderate-income housing
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Small business
Small Business Administration
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Voting rights
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic performance and conditions
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Federal-Indian relations
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Life, casualty, property insurance
Low- and moderate-income housing
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Small business
Small Business Administration
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3060/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3060/BILLS-116hr3060ih.pdf |