US HB3067 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes certain federal prisoners ineligible to receive good time credit. Specifically, it prohibits good time credit for a federal prisoner who is serving time for certain terrorism offenses.
Title
Maximum Incarceration for Terrorists Act
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-06-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2957 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1684 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1684 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Terrorism
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3067/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3067/BILLS-116hr3067ih.pdf |