US HB307 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lead by Example Act of 2017 This bill provides that, beginning January 3, 2019, the only health care plan the federal government may make available to Members of Congress and congressional staff shall be health care provided through the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA). By September 15, 2017, the VA and the Office of Personnel Management shall jointly submit to Congress a plan to carry out this bill, including recommendations for any necessary legislative actions.
Title
Lead by Example Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congress
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Health care costs and insurance
Members of Congress
Veterans' medical care
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Health care costs and insurance
Members of Congress
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/307/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr307/BILLS-115hr307ih.pdf |