US HB3078 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Intelligence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Intelligence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Iran Ballistic Missile Reporting Act of 2017 This bill amends the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2017 to extend through December 31, 2022, requirements for quarterly reports by: (1) the Office of the Director of National Intelligence on confirmed ballistic missile launches by Iran, and (2) the Departments of State and the Treasury on any efforts to impose unilateral or multilateral sanctions against the appropriate entities or individuals in connection with such a launch.
Title
Iran Ballistic Missile Reporting Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ruben Kihuen [D-NV] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Arms control and nonproliferation
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Sanctions
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Sanctions