US HB3079 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-15 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-15 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for energy savings performance contracts and utility energy service contracts in federal facilities. These contracts allow federal agencies to work with private contractors on energy efficiency upgrades to federal facilities, unless the facilities are dams, reservoirs, or hydropower facilities owned or operated by federal agencies.
Title
Energy Savings Through Public-Private Partnerships Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-09 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2020-01-09 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1706 (Same As) 2019-09-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 219.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Congressional oversight
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Solid waste and recycling
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Solid waste and recycling
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3079/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3079/BILLS-116hr3079ih.pdf |