US HB3087 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To make improvements to the Mentor-Protégé Program of the Department of Defense, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To make improvements to the Mentor-Protégé Program of the Department of Defense, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
2019-06-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2500 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Conference held.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2794 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB1320 (Related) 2019-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback