US HB3101 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AID Act Achieving Independence through Degrees Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AID Act Achieving Independence through Degrees Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
2019-06-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB792 (Related) 2019-01-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB1075 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB2129 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB416 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1137; text: CR S1137-1138)
SB839 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1905)
SB1496 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback