US HB3106 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Domestic and International Terrorism DATA Act Domestic and International Terrorism Documentation and Analysis of Threats in America Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic and International Terrorism DATA Act Domestic and International Terrorism Documentation and Analysis of Threats in America Act

Sponsors

Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-15SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-09-26HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-26HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-26HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8027-8028)
2019-09-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3106.
2019-09-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8027-8032)
2019-09-26HouseMr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-09-19HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 168.
2019-09-19HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
2019-09-19HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-213, Part I.
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-17HouseSubcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism Discharged.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-06-18HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism.
2019-06-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-05HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback