US HB3109 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Public Health Service Act to direct the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) to develop a multisite gestational diabetes (i.e., diabetes occuring during pregnancy) research project to expand and enhance surveillance data and public health research about gestational diabetes. The CDC must: (1) award grants for demonstration projects to reduce the incidence of gestational diabetes, the recurrence of such disease in subsequent pregnancies, and the development of type 2 diabetes in women with a history of gestational diabetes; and (2) work with state and tribal diabetes prevention and control programs assisted by the CDC to encourage postpartum follow-up after gestational diabetes to reduce the incidence of gestational diabetes and its recurrence, the development of type 2 diabetes in at-risk women, and related complications.
Title
GEDI Act Gestational Diabetes Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6637 (Related) 2020-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB4819 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6331-6332)
SB4819 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6331-6332)
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex and reproductive health
Women's health
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex and reproductive health
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3109/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3109/BILLS-116hr3109ih.pdf |