US HB3122 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-131. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-131. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Care Financial Protection Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs to include on its Internet website a warning to veterans relating to dishonest, predatory, or otherwise unlawful practices targeting individuals who are eligible for increased pension on the basis of need for regular aid and attendance. The Government Accountability Office shall: complete a study on financial exploitation of veterans, which shall include an analysis of the types of financial exploitation facing such veterans and any gaps in efforts to address these issues and an analysis of the types of standards used by federal and state agencies intended to protect vulnerable populations from financial exploitation; and submit a preliminary report and a final report to Congress.
Title
Veterans Care Financial Protection Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-131. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1191) |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-11-06 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8505) |
2017-11-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3122. |
2017-11-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8505-8507) |
2017-11-06 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 282. |
2017-11-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-385. |
2017-10-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote. |
2017-10-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1198 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Congressional oversight
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Veterans' pensions and compensation