US HB3132 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the use of "middle tier" defense acquisition programs. It requires the Department of Defense (DOD) to brief Congress on lessons learned and best practices identified through the use of the middle tier of acquisition programs intended to be completed in a period of two to five years, using two pathways: rapid prototyping and rapid fielding. An analysis shall accompany the briefing that includes (1) identification of lessons learned that can be applied to both middle tier and major acquisition programs, (2) description of the extent to which covered risk (determined by DOD) should be a factor in determining acquisition authority, and (3) description of whether requirements applicable to major defense acquisition programs should be applicable to middle tier programs.
Title
Rapid Fielding Defense Capabilities and Risk Assessment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-06-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3132/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3132/BILLS-116hr3132ih.pdf |