US HB3135 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Energy National Labs Jobs ACCESS Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Energy National Labs Jobs ACCESS Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
2019-06-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2500 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate.
SB1739 (Same As) 2019-09-11 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback