US HB3137 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-2)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the establishment of program for the provision of service dogs to certain Armed Forces members. It requires the Department of Defense to establish a K-9 Service Corps Program to award grants to nonprofit organizations to assist them in planning, designing, establishing, or operating programs to provide assistance dogs to members with a disability who are receiving receiving medical treatment, recuperation, or therapy; those in medical hold or medical holdover status; or those on the temporary disability retired list in cases where medical principles indicate that the disability may be of a permanent nature.
Title
Wounded Warrior Service Dog Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-06-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Armed forces and national security
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Mammals
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Neurological disorders
Service animals
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Mammals
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Neurological disorders
Service animals
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3137/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3137/BILLS-116hr3137ih.pdf |