US HB3145 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Pending: House Consumer Protection and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Transportation (DOT) to finalize regulations relating to automatic shutoff systems for motor vehicles and standards to prevent the movement of vehicles in specific situations. Specifically, DOT must require manufacturers to install technology in each motor vehicle with a keyless ignition device and an internal combustion engine to automatically shut off the motor vehicle after the motor vehicle has idled for a period necessary to prevent carbon monoxide poisoning; and a keyless ignition device and automatic transmission to prevent movement (i.e., rollaway) of the motor vehicle if (1) the transmission of the motor vehicle is not in the park setting, (2) the motor vehicle does not exceed the speed determined by DOT, (3) the door for the operator of the motor vehicle is open, (4) the seat belt of the operator of the motor vehicle is unbuckled, and (5) the service brake of the motor vehicle is not engaged.
Title
PARK IT Act Protecting Americans from the Risks of Keyless Ignition Technology Act
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB543 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2947 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2947 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Transportation
Motor vehicles
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Department of Transportation
Motor vehicles
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3145/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3145/BILLS-116hr3145ih.pdf |