US HB3148 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve protections for victims of sexual assault in the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.
Title
STOP Act of 2019 Sexual Trauma Ongoing Protections Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-06-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Department of Defense
Evidence and witnesses
Judicial procedure and administration
Military education and training
Military law
Military personnel and dependents
Sex offenses
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Department of Defense
Evidence and witnesses
Judicial procedure and administration
Military education and training
Military law
Military personnel and dependents
Sex offenses
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3148/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3148/BILLS-116hr3148ih.pdf |