US HB315 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Community Reclamation Partnerships Act This bill revises the Abandoned Mine Land Reclamation Program which restores land and water adversely impacted by surface coal mines that were abandoned before August 3, 1977. A state with an approved reclamation program may enter into a memorandum of understanding with relevant federal or state agencies for remediating mine drainage on abandoned mine land and water impacted by abandoned mines. In addition, the bill authorizes a partnership between a state and a community reclaimer for remediating abandoned mine land if the partnership's proposed project is consistent with an approved state memorandum of understanding and conducted on certain prioritized sites; the state assumes all responsibly on behalf of the community reclaimer and the owner of the proposed project site for costs or damages resulting from actions or inactions of the community reclaimer in carrying out the project, except for gross negligence or intentional misconduct by the community reclaimer; and the state has necessary legal authority to conduct the project and has financial resources to ensure the project's completion. A community reclaimer is a person who (1) voluntarily assists a state in a reclamation project, (2) did not participate in the creation of site conditions at the proposed site or activities that caused any land or waters to become eligible for reclamation or drainage abatement expenditures, (3) is not a past or current owner or operator of any site with ongoing reclamation obligations, and (4) is not subject to outstanding violations of surface coal mining permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Reclamation Partnerships Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-01HouseSubcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
2019-03-28HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback