US HB3165 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-9)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mental Health Parity Compliance Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Parity Compliance Act

Sponsors

Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]
Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-06-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-06-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1737 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback