US HB3167 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

National Flood Insurance Program Reauthorization Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Flood Insurance Program Reauthorization Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-06-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 59 - 0.
2019-06-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1610 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB1666 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2462 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB3146 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1276 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text: CR S2572-2573)

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Cooperative and condominium housing
Dams and canals
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency planning and evacuation
Farmland
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Insurance industry and regulation
Land use and conservation
Life, casualty, property insurance
Low- and moderate-income housing
Natural disasters
Public-private cooperation
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Rural conditions and development
Securities
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Urban and suburban affairs and development
User charges and fees

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback