US HB317 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Indians Land Affirmation Act of 2019 This bill ratifies and confirms the actions of the Department of the Interior to take approximately 1,427 acres of land in Santa Barbara County, California, into trust for the benefit of the Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Indians. The bill also ratifies the actions of Interior to assume jurisdiction over the appeals relating to the acquisition of this land, and dismiss those appeals. The land is made part of the Santa Ynez Indian Reservation. The bill removes restrictions on the land pursuant to certain state laws. Under the bill, gaming is prohibited on this land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Santa Ynez Band of Chumash Indians Land Affirmation Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
2019-04-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-29HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3292)
2019-04-29HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3295)
2019-04-29HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Van Drew objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
2019-04-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 317.
2019-04-29HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3291-3293)
2019-04-29HouseMr. Van Drew moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback