US HB3172 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it unlawful to manufacture, sell, or distribute crib bumpers or inclined sleepers for infants. Specifically, inclined sleepers for infants are those designed for an infant up to one year old and have an inclined sleep surface of greater than 10 degrees. Crib bumpers generally are padded materials inserted around the inside of a crib and intended to prevent the crib occupant from becoming trapped in any part of the crib's openings; they do not include unpadded, mesh crib liners.
Title
Safe Sleep for Babies Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-12-16 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10294) |
2019-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3172. |
2019-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10294-10295) |
2019-12-16 | House | Ms. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 163. |
2019-09-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-206. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-10 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-07-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-06-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1767 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.