US HB3174 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Defense to include, in workplace and gender relations surveys administered by the Office of People Analytics, questions regarding whether respondents have (1) experienced or witnessed in the workplace supremacist or extremist activity or racism, and (2) reported such activity.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Defense to include questions regarding supremacism, extremism, and racism in the workplace and equal opportunity, command climate, and workplace and gender relations surveys administered by the Office of People Analytics of the Department of Defense.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-06-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-06-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Defense
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Military command and structure
Military personnel and dependents
Political movements and philosophies
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Department of Defense
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Military command and structure
Military personnel and dependents
Political movements and philosophies
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3174/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3174/BILLS-116hr3174ih.pdf |