US HB3175 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a commission to review the state of defense research at certain minority institutions of higher education. Such institutions are historically black colleges and universities and other higher education institutions at which at least 50% of the total student enrollment consists of students from ethnic groups that are underrepresented in the fields of science and engineering. The commission shall consider how to advance research capacity at these institutions to address U.S. national security and defense needs. The bill also directs the Department of Defense to require that the system that monitors or records contractor past performance for a grant or contract awarded to an institution includes incentives for the award of a subgrant or subcontract to such minority institutions.
Title
Harnessing Opportunity to Maximize Expansion, Capture, and Organization of Minority Innovation in the Next Generation of Research Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities. |
2019-06-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-06-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Defense
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Minority education
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Defense
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Minority education
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3175/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3175/BILLS-116hr3175ih.pdf |