US HB319 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates specified river segments in the Wood-Pawcatuck watershed in Rhode Island and Connecticut as scenic, recreational, or wild rivers and as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.
Title
Wood-Pawcatuck Watershed Wild and Scenic River Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB45 (Same As) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S69-70)
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Connecticut
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Rhode Island
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Rhode Island
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/319/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr319/BILLS-116hr319ih.pdf |