US HB3201 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Maritime Administration Authorization and Enhancement Act for Fiscal Year 2018
Title
Maritime Administration Authorization and Enhancement Act for Fiscal Year 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces. |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2017-07-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1096 (Same As) 2017-07-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 182.
SB1100 (Related) 2017-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
SB1100 (Related) 2017-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Appropriations
Assault and harassment offenses
Buy American requirements
Credit and credit markets
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Department of Transportation
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Manufacturing
Marine and inland water transportation
Metals
Military education and training
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Sex offenses
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Telephone and wireless communication
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Vocational and technical education
Assault and harassment offenses
Buy American requirements
Credit and credit markets
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Department of Transportation
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Manufacturing
Marine and inland water transportation
Metals
Military education and training
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Sex offenses
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Telephone and wireless communication
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3201/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3201/BILLS-115hr3201ih.pdf |