US HB3202 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment.
Pending: House Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment.
Pending: House Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Defense and Department of State to report to Congress on the value of North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) member-state investments in dual-use infrastructure projects. Dual-use infrastructure projects are those identified by the European Union as upgrades to the Trans-European Transport Network that also improve military mobility.
Title
Strengthening Support of NATO Through Dual Use Infrastructure Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Alliances
Aviation and airports
Collective security
Europe
Infrastructure development
International affairs
Marine and inland water transportation
Military operations and strategy
Railroads
Roads and highways
Aviation and airports
Collective security
Europe
Infrastructure development
International affairs
Marine and inland water transportation
Military operations and strategy
Railroads
Roads and highways
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3202/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3202/BILLS-116hr3202ih.pdf |