US HB3206 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting Europe's Energy Security Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Europe's Energy Security Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-06-26HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-06-26HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-06-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1790 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Conference held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback