US HB3216 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses sexual assault in the armed forces. It directs the Department of Defense to establish a Defense Advisory Committee for the Prevention of Sexual Misconduct. Upon a determination not to refer a case of alleged sexual assault for trial by court-martial, the commander making such determination shall notify the victim, at least monthly, of the status of further action. The bill also allows each military department to detail certain enlisted members meeting requirements for acceptance of a commission as commissioned officers as students at accredited U.S. law schools for a period of legal training leading to a law degree. A service member agreeing to such training will, upon completion, accept a commission as a judge advocate or law specialist. Selections shall be on a competitive basis for active duty for a two-year period (in addition to any other service obligation).
Title
Prevention of Sexual Assault in the Armed Forces Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB1526 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB1526 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Department of Defense
Higher education
Lawyers and legal services
Military education and training
Military law
Military personnel and dependents
Sex offenses
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Department of Defense
Higher education
Lawyers and legal services
Military education and training
Military law
Military personnel and dependents
Sex offenses
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3216/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3216/BILLS-116hr3216ih.pdf |