US HB3227 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Defense to carry out a program of research, development, testing, evaluation, study, and demonstration of technologies related to blue carbon capture and direct air capture, with the goals of developing technologies to turn carbon dioxide into clean fuels, creating products for military uses, and using the technologies at military facilities and in military transportation. The bill defines "blue carbon capture" as the removal of dissolved carbon dioxide from seawater through engineered or inorganic processes and "direct air capture" as the use of equipment to capture carbon dioxide directly from the air.
Title
SEA FUEL Act of 2019 Securing Energy for our Armed Forces Using Engineering Leadership Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-06-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB1679 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB1679 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Armed forces and national security
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Government studies and investigations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Military facilities and property
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Motor fuels
Technology assessment
Alternative and renewable resources
Armed forces and national security
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Government studies and investigations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Military facilities and property
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Motor fuels
Technology assessment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3227/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3227/BILLS-116hr3227ih.pdf |