US HB3228 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 553.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 553.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes health professional trainees of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide treatment to veterans via telemedicine. To provide such treatment, a trainee must be under the supervision of a VA health care professional who is authorized to provide health care via telemedicine.
Title
VA Mission Telehealth Clarification Act
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] |
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 553. |
2020-09-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4680-4681) |
2020-09-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3228. |
2020-09-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4680-4682) |
2020-09-22 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-07-23 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-06-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3643 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 545.
HB7992 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
HB7992 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Veterans' medical care
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Veterans' medical care