US HB3239 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 161-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Humanitarian Standards for Individuals in Customs and Border Protection Custody Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Humanitarian Standards for Individuals in Customs and Border Protection Custody Act

Sponsors

Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-06-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
2019-06-12HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-12HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-12HouseIntroduced in House
2019-06-11HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4402)

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback