US HB3252 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 94-1)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Global Respect Act This bill imposes visa-blocking sanctions on foreign persons responsible for or complicit in violating the human rights of individuals due to actual or perceived sexual orientation, gender identity, or sex characteristics. The President shall report and periodically update a list of foreign persons responsible for such human rights violations and apply sanctions accordingly. The Department of State shall designate at least one senior officer who shall be responsible for tracking violence and discrimination against individuals based on actual or perceived sexual orientation, gender identity, or sex characteristics in foreign countries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Global Respect Act

Sponsors

Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-06-20HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-06-20HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-06-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1825 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB3874 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB3004 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback