US HB3263 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting NATO Skies Act of 2019 This bill prohibits the transfer of an F-35 aircraft to Turkey and various activities related to such a transfer. The prohibition may be waived if the President certifies to Congress that Turkey does not intend to accept delivery of the S-400 air defense system, which Turkey has agreed to buy from Russia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting NATO Skies Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2512 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1102 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 142.
SB922 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback