US HB3278 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission to establish a funding program to expand broadband access for unserved and underserved areas and unserved anchor institutions, such as schools or libraries. The program shall consist of both a national reverse auction and population-based grants to states.
Title
Connect America Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HB7302 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB4131 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB7302 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB4131 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Educational facilities and institutions
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Health facilities and institutions
Indian social and development programs
Internet and video services
Libraries and archives
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public contracts and procurement
Public housing
Science, technology, communications
State and local finance
Congressional oversight
Educational facilities and institutions
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Health facilities and institutions
Indian social and development programs
Internet and video services
Libraries and archives
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public contracts and procurement
Public housing
Science, technology, communications
State and local finance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3278/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3278/BILLS-116hr3278ih.pdf |